GA HB680 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-19 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-19 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to primaries and elections generally, so as to provide that direct recording electronic voting systems shall not be used in primaries or elections in this state after January 1, 2019; to repeal provisions regarding voting machines; to provide for definitions; to provide for ballot marking devices and standards and procedures for such devices; to provide for risk-limiting audits and for definitions, intent, and procedures; to provide for conforming changes; to provide for related matters; to provide a short title; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elections; direct recording electronic voting systems shall not be used in primaries or elections in this state after January 1, 2019; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Scot Turner [R] | Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] | Rep. Sam Teasley [R] | Rep. Howard Mosby [D] |
Rep. Michael Caldwell [R] | Rep. Robert Trammell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-18 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-11 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52025 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/171077 |