GA HB68 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 4 of Article 1 of Chapter 18 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the operation of funeral establishments and crematories, so as to provide for a procedure for the disposition of cremains after a certain time period; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Funeral establishments and crematories; disposition of cremains; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Don Balfour [R] | Rep. Chuck Sims [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #482 - Adopt Ccr (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 25 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #410 - Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #275 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-05 - House - House Vote #138 - Pass (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #410 - Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #275 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-05 - House - House Vote #138 - Pass (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2009-04-30 | Act 68 | |
2009-04-30 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-14 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-03 | House Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed | |
2009-04-03 | House Conference Committee Appointed | |
2009-04-03 | House Insists | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Insists | |
2009-03-30 | House Disagrees Senate Amend/Sub | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-23 | Senate Recommitted | |
2009-03-20 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-19 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-05 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-05 | House Third Readers | |
2009-02-25 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-15 | House Second Readers | |
2009-01-14 | House First Readers |