GA HB678 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act establishing the compensation of certain officials in Richmond County, approved April 12, 1982 (Ga. L. 1982, p. 3941), as amended, particularly by an Act approved February 4, 2002 (Ga. L. 2002, p. 3505), so as to change the compensation of the judge of the probate court; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Richmond County; Probate Court; change compensation of judge
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Howard [D] | Rep. Gloria Frazier [D] | Rep. Sheila Nelson [D] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] |
Rep. Brian Prince [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #374 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #310 (Y: 152 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #310 (Y: 152 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 177 | |
2019-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-25 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-25 | House | House Hopper |