GA HB678 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance, so as to provide for consumer protections regarding health insurance; to provide for definitions; to provide for disclosure requirements of providers, hospitals, and insurers; to provide for billing, reimbursement, and arbitration of certain services; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; consumer protections regarding health insurance; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-12 - House - House Vote #486 (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-12HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-12HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-07HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-19HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-18HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-11HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback