GA HB678 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance, so as to provide for consumer protections regarding health insurance; to provide for definitions; to provide for disclosure requirements of providers, hospitals, and insurers; to provide for billing, reimbursement, and arbitration of certain services; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; consumer protections regarding health insurance; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] |
Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - House - House Vote #486 (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-18 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-11 | House | House Hopper |