GA HB676 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2023-06-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide for the compensation of the chairperson and members of the Board of Education of Ben Hill County, approved March 22, 1990 (Ga. L.1990, p. 4435), as amended, so as to modify the compensation of the members of the Board of Education of Ben Hill County; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ben Hill County; Board of Education; modify compensation of members

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-20 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #243 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #229 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-03 Effective Date 2023-06-01
2023-05-03 Act 289
2023-05-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2023-03-30HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2023-03-20SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2023-03-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2023-03-15SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-03-14HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2023-03-14HouseHouse Third Readers
2023-03-14HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2023-03-08HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-03-07HouseHouse First Readers
2023-03-06HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback