GA HB676 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-05-04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-05-04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 2 of the O.C.G.A., relating to agriculture, so as to create the Georgia Farmers' Market and Produce Terminal Development Authority; to amend Chapter 15 of Title 45 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Attorney General, so as to provide for the inclusion of the Georgia Farmers' Market and Produce Terminal Development Authority as a state authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Farmers' Market and Produce Terminal Development Authority Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Penny Houston [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Carl Gilliard [D] |
Rep. Noel Williams [R] | Rep. Regina Lewis-Ward [D] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Sub: House Vote #399 (Y: 166 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #352 (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #188 (Y: 166 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #352 (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #188 (Y: 166 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective Date 2021-05-04 | |
2021-05-04 | Act 204 | |
2021-05-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-09 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-26 | House | House Hopper |