GA HB673 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to enact "Georgia's Return to Play Act of 2012"; to amend Part 15 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to miscellaneous provisions under the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to establish a return to play policy for student athletes suffering from concussions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia's Return to Play Act of 2012; enact
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-13 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2012-01-11 | House Second Readers | |
2012-01-10 | House First Readers | |
2011-11-16 | House Prefiled |