GA HB67 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 16 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to public property, so as to extend automatic repeals of certain provisions regarding writing off small amounts due to the state; to amend Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to education, so as to extend automatic repeals of certain provisions regarding nonlapsing revenue of institutions in the University System of Georgia and the Technical College System of Georgia; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government; public property; extend automatic repeals of certain provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - House - Passage: House Vote #40 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-11HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2021-02-11HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-02-04HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2021-01-14HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-01-13HouseHouse First Readers
2021-01-12HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback