GA HB67 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Legislative Retirement System, so as to provide for definitions; to change certain provisions relating to employee contributions to the retirement system, payment of employee contributions on behalf of the member, and additional contributions; to change certain provisions relating to prior service credit for military service; to change certain provisions relating to eligibility and application for a retirement allowance, early retirement, amount of retirement allowance, compliance with federal tax laws, and increases in retirement allowance; to provide for related matters; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Legislative Retirement System; employee contributions; change certain provisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-29HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-01-30HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-01-29HouseHouse First Readers
2019-01-28HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback