GA HB67 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to theft, so as to provide for increased punishment for entering an automobile or other motor vehicle with the intent to commit a theft or felony; to provide for another type of crime of entering an automobile or other motor vehicle with the intent to commit a theft or felony and provide for punishment therefor; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and offenses; entering a motor vehicle with the intent to commit a theft or felony; provide for increased punishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #200 (Y: 151 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenateSenate Recommitted
2018-01-08SenateSenate Taken from Table
2017-03-28SenateSenate Tabled
2017-03-20SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-06SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-01HouseHouse Postponed
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-25HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-24HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-23HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback