GA HB67 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for the unified government of Milledgeville-Baldwin County; to provide for boundaries and districts; to provide for powers and duties; to provide for organization, qualifications, election, terms, and filling of vacancies; to provide for associated offices, departments, and agencies; to provide for budgets and financial matters; to provide for a transition period; to provide for the repeal of certain Acts; to provide for a referendum; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Milledgeville-Baldwin County; provide for unified government; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #34 (Y: 45 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Vote #19 (Y: 146 N: 9 NV: 14 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-05 Effective Date
2015-05-05 Act 83
2015-05-05HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2015-04-06HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2015-02-18SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2015-02-18SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2015-02-04SenateSenate Read and Referred
2015-02-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2015-02-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2015-02-03HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2015-01-27HouseHouse Second Readers
2015-01-26HouseHouse First Readers
2015-01-15HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback