GA HB669 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the compensation of certain officials in Chatham County, approved March 26, 1986 (Ga. L. 1986, p. 4797), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 29, 2007 (Ga. L. 2007, p. 4351), so as to provide for the compensation of certain Chatham County officials; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Chatham County; provide for compensation of certain officials
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. R Bryant [D] | Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Rep. Edward Stephens [D] |
Rep. Craig Gordon [D] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #322 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #449 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House Vote #340 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #449 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House Vote #340 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-12 | Act 290 | |
2015-05-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-14 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-27 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2015-03-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-25 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-25 | House | House Hopper |