GA HB668 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of Macon-Bibb County to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal specific Acts; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Macon-Bibb County; levy an excise tax
Sponsors
Rep. Miriam Paris [D] | Rep. James Beverly [D] | Rep. Danny Mathis [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] |
Rep. Dale Washburn [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #374 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #294 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #294 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 176 | |
2019-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-22 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-22 | House | House Hopper |