GA HB668 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 4 of Title 29 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to procedure for appointment, so as to provide for petitions for appointment of a guardian and orders of appointment for adult guardianship under certain circumstances where the proposed ward is at least 17 years of age but has not attained 18 years of age; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Guardian and ward; petitions for appointment of a guardian under certain circumstances; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Betty Price [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] |
Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - House Vote #496 (Y: 115 N: 44 NV: 14 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-11 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-10 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/51990 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/171007 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/51990#15641 |