GA HB668 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create the City of Peachtree City Public Facilities Authority, approved May 13, 2011 (Ga. L. 2011, p. 4121), so as to add an additional power; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Peachtree City Public Facilities Authority; add an additional power
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #265 (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House Vote #319 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House Vote #319 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-12 | Act 289 | |
2015-05-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-25 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-25 | House | House Hopper |