GA HB665 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]


A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 7 of Title 52 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to abandoned vessels, so as to revise notice requirements regarding abandoned vessels; to eliminate duplication of notices to the Department of Natural Resources and the Georgia Bureau of Investigation; to provide that such notice shall only be made to the Department of Natural Resources; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Abandoned vessels; revise notice requirements; provisions


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - House - House Vote #489 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]


2018-03-09SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-07SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-14SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-13HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-02-13HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-08HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-11HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-10HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-09HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

Bill Comments