GA HB66 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 24 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating generally to insurance, so as to provide for certificate of insurance forms to be approved by the commissioner; to provide for definitions; to provide certain provisions of such certificate; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; certificate of insurance forms approved by commissioner; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-14 - House - House Vote #345 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #224 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Vote #80 - Passage (Y: 157 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-07-01 Effective Date
2011-05-11 Act 106
2011-05-11 House Date Signed by Governor
2011-04-21 House Sent to Governor
2011-04-14 House Agree Senate Amend or Sub
2011-03-30 Senate Passed/Adopted
2011-03-30 Senate Third Read
2011-03-29 Senate Read Second Time
2011-03-28 Senate Committee Favorably Reported
2011-03-03 Senate Read and Referred
2011-03-02 House Passed/Adopted
2011-03-02 House Third Readers
2011-02-24 House Committee Favorably Reported
2011-01-26 House Second Readers
2011-01-25 House First Readers

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback