GA HB659 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 6 of Article 8 of Chapter 2 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to judges of the Supreme Court, judges of the Court of Appeals, and their employees, so as to decrease the age of eligibility for retirement benefits for appellate court judges; to provide for related matters; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Retirement and pensions; age of eligibility for retirement benefits for appellate court judges; decrease
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Robert Trammell [D] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] |
Rep. Matthew Wilson [D] | Rep. Patty Stinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-25 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-22 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/56107 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/185417 |