GA HB657 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 4 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding dangerous instrumentalities and practices, so as to make unlawful the knowing and intentional provision of any firearm for the purpose of providing such firearm to any person known to be on probation as a felony first offender or to have been convicted of a felony; to provide for criminal penalties; to clarify that affirmative confirmation by firearm provider is not required; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; providing to person on probation as a felony first offender; make unlawful

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #811 (Y: 162 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #811 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #694 (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #727 (Y: 45 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Vote #517 (Y: 156 N: 3 NV: 12 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01 Effective Date
2018-05-07 Act 413
2018-05-07HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2018-03-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-27SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-27SenateSenate Engrossed
2018-03-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-20SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-15HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-02-15HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-05HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-18HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-11HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-10HouseHouse Hopper
2017-12-13HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback