GA HB656 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create a board of elections and registration for Fulton County, Georgia, approved March 30, 1989 (Ga. L. 1989, p. 4577), as amended, so as to revise the manner of appointment of the chairperson of the board; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fulton County; board of elections and registration; revise manner of appointment of chairperson

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #374 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #294 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07 Effective Date
2019-05-07 Act 242
2019-05-07HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-11HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-04-02SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-29SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-26HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-26HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-25HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-03-22HouseHouse First Readers
2019-03-21HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback