GA HB655 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for the administration of the budget of the Magistrate Court of Fulton County; to provide that the court administrator shall be the chief magistrate or his or her designee; to provide that such court administrator shall have oversight of the budget; to provide that such court administrator is authorized to make changes to line item appropriations; to provide that any unexpended funds at the end of the fiscal year shall lapse to the general fund of Fulton County; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Fulton County; Magistrate Court; provide court administrator be chief magistrate or his or her designee; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Mike Dudgeon [R] | Rep. Joe Wilkinson [R] |
Rep. Mike Jacobs [R] | Rep. Matt Dollar [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #265 (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - House Vote #305 (Y: 131 N: 21 NV: 14 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - House Vote #305 (Y: 131 N: 21 NV: 14 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-12 | Act 284 | |
2015-05-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-24 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-24 | House | House Hopper |