GA HB654 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 19-6-15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to child support in final verdict or decree, guidelines for determining amount of award, continuation of duty to provide support, and duration of support, so as to enact reforms recommended by the Georgia Child Support Commission; to clarify and revise a definition; to clarify the process of calculating child support when there is more than one child for whom support is being determined under certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child support; reforms recommended by the Ga. Child Support Commission; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - House - House Vote #491 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-14SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-13HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-02-13HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-07HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-10HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-09HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-08HouseHouse Hopper
2017-11-29HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback