GA HB653 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on November 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to professions and businesses, so as to provide that certain professional licensing boards are authorized but not required to suspend the license of a person upon notice of nonpayment or default on a federal educational loan or service conditional scholarship; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professional licensing boards; authorized to suspend license of person upon notice of nonpayment on a federal educational loan; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Spencer [R] | Rep. Carolyn Hugley [D] | Rep. Paulette Rakestraw [R] | Rep. Renitta Shannon [D] |
Rep. Heath Clark [R] | Rep. Susan Holmes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-18 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-11 | House | House Hopper |
2017-11-29 | House | House Prefiled |