GA HB652 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-19 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to primaries and elections generally, so as to eliminate certain electors list maintenance activities; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; certain electors list maintenance activities; eliminate

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-19HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-18HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-11HouseHouse Hopper
2017-11-21HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback