GA HB65 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 31-2A-18 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the establishment of the Low THC Oil Patient Registry, definitions, purpose, registration cards, quarterly reports, and waiver forms, so as to change provisions relating to conditions and eligibility; to provide a definition; to remove certain reporting requirements; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Low THC Oil Patient Registry; conditions and eligibility; change provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #825 (Y: 146 N: 10 NV: 22 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #812 (Y: 37 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #676 (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Vote #163 (Y: 156 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01 Effective Date
2018-05-03 Act 302
2018-05-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2018-03-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-23SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-01HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-01HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-24HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-23HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-12HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/HB/65
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/162854.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/166940.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/167331.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/177273.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/177750.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/177670.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/177768.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178032.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178906.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=14976
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16144
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16406
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16273

Bill Comments

feedback