GA HB65 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elementary and secondary education, so as to require local boards of education and certain charter schools to hold at least two public meetings on the proposed annual operating budget; to require that a summary of the proposed and adopted annual operating budget be posted on the Internet; to require that the detailed annual operating budget be made available upon request; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; local boards of education and certain charter schools to hold at least two public meetings on the proposed annual operating budget; require
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Caldwell [R] | Rep. Matthew Ramsey [R] | Rep. Sam Teasley [R] | Rep. Scot Turner [R] |
Rep. Mike Dudgeon [R] | Rep. Stephen Allison [R] | Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - House - House Vote #819 (Y: 158 N: 3 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #619 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Vote #34 (Y: 170 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #619 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Vote #34 (Y: 170 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 612 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-22 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-01-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-15 | House | House Hopper |