GA HB647 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 2 of Chapter 8 of Title 12 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions relative to solid waste management, so as to provide for post-closure ground-water monitoring at closed coal combustion residual impoundments; to provide for definitions; to provide for ground-water monitoring reports; to amend Part 3 of Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to criminal trespass and damage to property relative to waste control, so as to provide for a conforming cross-reference; to amend Part 1 of Article 3 of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the O.C.G.A., relating to county special purpose local option sales tax, so as to provide for conforming cross-references; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Solid waste management; post-closure ground-water monitoring at closed coal combustion residual impoundments; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Vance Smith [R] | Rep. Lynn Smith [R] | Rep. Dale Washburn [R] | Sen. Ricky Williams [R] |
Rep. Robert Dickey [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - House - Passage: House Vote #165 (Y: 161 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-25 | House | House Hopper |