GA HB647 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the appointment of the chief magistrate of Clayton County, approved March 21, 1984 (Ga. L. 1984, p. 4411), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 4, 2006 (Ga. L. 2006, p. 4136), so as to change the salary of the chief magistrate; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Clayton County; chief magistrate; change salary
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Valencia Stovall [D] | Rep. Ronnie Mabra [D] | Rep. Darryl Jordan [D] |
Rep. Mike Glanton [D] | Rep. Demetrius Douglas [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - House - House Vote #319 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-24 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-23 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/44874 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/151924 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/44874#12714 |