GA HB642 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to local government, so as to provide definitions; to provide for the creation and termination of special improvement districts; to provide for the levying of a special improvement tax in such districts; to provide for the disposition and use of the funds from such districts; to provide for special services to the districts; to provide for an effective date; to provide for termination; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government; provide definitions; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #629 (Y: 163 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-08HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-30HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-28HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback