GA HB638 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 14 of Title 51 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to asbestos and silica claims, so as to revise filing requirements for asbestos claims and silica claims; to provide for nonliability of product liability defendants in certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Torts; asbestos claims and silica claims; revise filing requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-25 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/60081 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/198801 |