GA HB638 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Stockbridge, approved April 4, 1991 (Ga. L. 1991, p. 4359), as amended, so as to revise the corporate boundaries of the city; to provide for related matters; to provide for a referendum; to provide for contingent effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Stockbridge, City of; revise corporate boundaries
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Rutledge [R] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Rep. Karen Mathiak [R] |
Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. Geoff Cauble [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - House - House Vote #510 (Y: 63 N: 96 NV: 13 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - House - House Vote #498 (Y: 55 N: 95 NV: 19 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - House - House Vote #500 (Y: 107 N: 50 NV: 12 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Vote #498 (Y: 55 N: 95 NV: 19 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - House - House Vote #500 (Y: 107 N: 50 NV: 12 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-14 | House | House Notice to Reconsider |
2018-02-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-30 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-28 | House | House Hopper |