GA HB637 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the Lula Development Authority; to provide a short title; to provide definitions; to provide for the powers of the authority; to provide for members of the authority; to provide a development area; to provide for revenue bonds and other obligations of the authority; to recite constitutional authority; to provide for effect on other authorities; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Lula Development Authority Act; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #374 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Vote #275 (Y: 156 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Vote #275 (Y: 156 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 160 | |
2019-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-25 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2019-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-18 | House | House Hopper |