GA HB635 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 15 of the O.C.G.A., relating to courts, so as to provide that each judge of the superior court, state court, and probate court and each magistrate shall have authority to perform any lawful judicial act regardless of where he or she is physically located at the time of such act; to amend Title 17 of the O.C.G.A., relating to criminal procedure, so as to provide for the issuance of arrest warrants by a judge regardless of where such judge is physically located; to revise standards for holding a court of inquiry; to amend Article 1 of Chapter 6 of Title 15 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding superior courts, so as to revise when superior courts are authorized to use alternative locations; to provide for criteria; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts; each judge of the superior court, state court, and probate court and each magistrate shall have authority to perform any lawful judicial act; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Sub: House Vote #374 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #302 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Passage: House Vote #152 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04 Effective Date
2021-05-04 Act 202
2021-05-04HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2021-04-07HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2021-03-31HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2021-03-29SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-29SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-25SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-25SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-03-05SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-02-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-25HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-24HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-24HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback