GA HB631 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 35-3-33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to powers and duties of the Georgia Crime Information Center, so as to provide for the development and operation of a system to voluntarily collect and disseminate information relating to conditions that may impede an individual's ability to communicate with law enforcement or emergency responders; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Crime Information Center; develop a system to collect information on an individual's ability to communicate with law enforcement or emergency responders; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Cheokas [R] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] |
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. J Collins [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Sub: House Vote #401 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #279 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #230 (Y: 169 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #279 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #230 (Y: 169 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 143 | |
2021-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-24 | House | House Hopper |