GA HB63 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5C of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to alternative ad valorem tax on motor vehicles, so as to revise the definition of fair market value of the motor vehicle to exclude certain interest and financing charges for leased motor vehicles; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alternative ad valorem tax; motor vehicles; revise definition of fair market value

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-17 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #218 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Senate Vote #216 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Passage: House Vote #96 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-01 Effective Date
2021-05-04 Act 169
2021-05-04HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2021-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2021-03-17SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2021-03-17SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-17SenateSenate Engrossed
2021-03-15SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-11SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2021-02-26SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-25HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-02-25HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-02-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-01-14HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-01-13HouseHouse First Readers
2021-01-12HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback