GA HB628 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to change the method of filling vacancies on the board of the hospital authority of Walker, Dade, and Catoosa counties, approved April 12, 1982 (Ga. L. 1982, p. 4531), so as to revise the method of filling vacancies; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Walker, Dade and Catoosa Counties; board of hospital authority; revise method of filling vacancies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #324 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - House Vote #332 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - House Vote #332 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-02 | Act 130 | |
2013-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-08 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-22 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-20 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-20 | House | House Hopper |