GA HB626 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to incorporate the City of Sharon Springs; to provide a charter; to provide for a referendum; to provide for prior ordinances and rules, pending matters, and existing personnel; to provide for penalties; to provide for definitions and construction; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sharon Springs, City of; incorporate
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #588 (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Vote #480 (Y: 159 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Vote #480 (Y: 159 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | Effective Date | |
2018-03-12 | Act 287 | |
2018-03-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-03-09 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-07 | House | House Postponed |
2018-02-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-28 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-03-28 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-28 | House | House Hopper |