GA HB624 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Legislative Retirement System, so as to define certain terms; to change certain provisions relating to employee contributions to the retirement system, payment of employee contributions on behalf of the member, and additional contributions; to change certain provisions relating to prior service credit for military service; to change certain provisions relating to eligibility and application for a retirement allowance, early retirement, amount of retirement allowance, compliance with federal tax laws, and increases in retirement allowance; to provide for related matters; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Legislative Retirement System; define certain terms; change certain provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - House Vote #658 (Y: 117 N: 42 NV: 14 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateSenate Tabled
2018-03-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-14HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-30HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-28HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-24HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback