GA HB622 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a homestead exemption from certain Bartow County ad valorem taxes for county purposes in the amount of $5,000.00 of the assessed value of the homestead for certain residents of that county, approved March 24, 1994 (Ga. L. 1994, p. 4058), so as to increase the exemption to $15,000.00; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal, mandatory execution of election and judicial remedies regarding failure to comply; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bartow County; ad valorem tax; increase homestead exemption to $15,000.00

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-15 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #232 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #219 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01 Effective Date 2023-05-01
2023-05-01 Act 161
2023-05-01HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2023-03-30HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2023-03-15SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2023-03-15SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2023-03-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-03-09HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2023-03-09HouseHouse Third Readers
2023-03-09HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2023-03-02HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2023-02-28HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback