GA HB622 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the membership of the Sinclair Water Authority, approved April 13, 2001 (Ga. L. 2001, p. 3648), as amended, so as to change the determination of a quorum of the members of the board of said authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sinclair Water Authority; determination of a quorum of the members of the board; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #274 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Vote #267 (Y: 147 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Vote #267 (Y: 147 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-02 | Act 22 | |
2019-04-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-18 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-14 | House | House Hopper |