GA HB617 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to postsecondary education, so as to provide that student athletes participating in intercollegiate athletic programs at postsecondary educational institutions may receive compensation for the use of the student athlete's name, image, or likeness; to provide for application to intercollegiate athletic associations; to allow for professional representation of such student athletes participating in intercollegiate athletics; to provide for findings; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Postsecondary education; student athletes may receive compensation for use of name, image, or likeness; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Senate - Agree To House Amendment To Senate Amendment: Senate Vote #440 (Y: 43 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Am As Am: House Vote #413 (Y: 163 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passage As Amended : Senate Vote #401 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 46th: Senate Vote #400 (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #207 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01 Effective Date
2021-05-06 Act 228
2021-05-06HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2021-04-09HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2021-03-31SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2021-03-31HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2021-03-31SenateSenate Passed/Adopted As Amended
2021-03-31SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-31SenateSenate Taken from Table
2021-03-29SenateSenate Tabled
2021-03-25SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-25SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2021-03-09SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-03-08HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-08HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-03-05HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-25HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-24HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-23HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59992
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/198490
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/199664
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/199938
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/202577
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/202373
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/202189
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/202123
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59992#18457
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59992#18902
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59992#18903
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59992#18811
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59992#18942

Bill Comments

feedback