GA HB617 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide that the grand jury of Haralson County shall not be required to be impaneled on the first day of each term; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Haralson County; grand jury shall not be required to be impaneled on the first day of each term; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Kevin Cooke [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #304 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Vote #255 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Vote #255 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-30 | Act 86 | |
2019-04-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-08 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-14 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-13 | House | House Hopper |