GA HB613 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Flovilla, approved April 5, 1993 (Ga. L. 1993, p. 4663), as amended, so as to dissolve the municipal court; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Flovilla, City of; municipal court; dissolve
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #274 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Vote #267 (Y: 147 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Vote #267 (Y: 147 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-30 | Act 83 | |
2019-04-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-14 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-13 | House | House Hopper |