GA HB611 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of the City of South Fulton to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
South Fulton, City of; levy an excise tax
Sponsors
Rep. Derrick Jackson [D] | Rep. Debra Bazemore [D] | Rep. Roger Bruce [D] | Rep. William Boddie [D] |
Rep. Marie Metze [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #374 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Vote #255 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Vote #255 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-30 | Act 81 | |
2019-04-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-14 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-13 | House | House Hopper |