GA HB610 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 322
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for a supplement to the salaries of the judges of the superior court of the Clayton Judicial Circuit, approved April 10, 1969 (Ga. L. 1969, p. 353), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 5, 2006 (Ga. L. 2006, p. 4683), so as to increase the county supplement to the state salary of said judges; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clayton Judicial Circuit; judges of superior court; increase county supplement to state salary

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #588 (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #300 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03 Act 322
2018-05-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-02HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-09SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-24SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-24HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-03-24HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-20HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-20HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback