GA HB605 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Conference Committee Appointed 180th, 40th, 34th
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 3 of Title 9 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to specific periods of limitation, so as to change provisions relating to the revival of certain claims involving childhood sexual abuse; to provide for civil actions by the Attorney General under certain circumstances; to provide for a civil penalty; to provide for a report; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hidden Predator Act of 2018; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #761 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #814 (Y: 26 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #621 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed 180th, 40th, 34th
2018-03-29HouseHouse Insisted
2018-03-29SenateSenate Insisted
2018-03-29HouseHouse Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
2018-03-29SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-29SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-29SenateSenate Taken from Table
2018-03-27SenateSenate Tabled
2018-03-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-24HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-22HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-20HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback