GA HB603 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide for the compensation of the judges of the State Court of Fulton County, the judges of the Juvenile Court of Fulton County, and the judge of the Probate Court of Fulton County, approved April 19, 2000 (Ga. L. 2000, p. 3904), so as to modify the compensation of the judges of the State Court of Fulton County; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Fulton County; State Court; modify compensation of judges
Sponsors
Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. William Boddie [D] | Rep. David Dreyer [D] | Rep. Derrick Jackson [D] |
Rep. Patricia Gardner [D] | Rep. Beth Beskin [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #299 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #301 (Y: 131 N: 19 NV: 22 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #301 (Y: 131 N: 19 NV: 22 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-04 | Act 159 | |
2017-05-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-20 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-16 | House | House Hopper |