GA HB60 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to education, so as to provide for the establishment of educational scholarship accounts; to provide for a short title; to provide for definitions; to provide for qualified education expenses; to provide for qualifications for students to participate in the account program; to establish certain requirements for participating schools and service providers; to provide for accounts and account funds; to establish a Parent Review Committee to review expenditures upon request; to authorize the Office of Student Achievement to promulgate rules and regulations; to provide for annual testing of participating students; to provide for an annual report on the account program; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Educational Scholarship Act; enact

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2021-03-05HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2021-02-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-01-13HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-01-12HouseHouse First Readers
2021-01-11HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback