GA HB6 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 4 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to public assistance, so as to provide for the submission of a waiver request by the Department of Human Services to permit the recipients of certain public assistance benefits to use such benefits for the purpose of purchasing diapers or menstrual hygiene products if the United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service makes such waiver available to states; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public assistance; use certain benefits for purchasing diapers or menstrual products; provide for waiver request
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-06 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-02 | House | House Hopper |
2022-12-21 | House | House Prefiled |